No. 19-672
Title:The Rams Football Company, LLC, et al., Petitioners
v.
St. Louis Regional Convention and Sports Complex Authority, et al.
Docketed:November 26, 2019
Lower Ct:Court of Appeals of Missouri, Eastern District
   Case Numbers:(ED106282-01)
   Decision Date:April 16, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:September 3, 2019

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 21 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 26, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 20 2019Brief of respondents St. Louis Regional Convention and Sports Complex Authority, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 08 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/24/2020.
Jan 08 2020Reply of petitioners The Rams Football Company, LLC, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 14 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/21/2020.
Feb 24 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/28/2020.
Mar 02 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/6/2020.
Mar 16 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/20/2020.
Mar 23 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/27/2020.
Mar 30 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/3/2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

paul.clement@kirkland.com
2023895000
Party name: The Rams Football Company, LLC, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
James Forrest Bennett
    Counsel of Record
Bowd Bennett LLP
7733 Forsyth Boulevard
Suite 1900
St. Louis, MO 63105

jbennett@dowdbennett.com
3148897300
Party name: St. Louis Regional Convention and Sports Complex Authority, et al.