No. 19-67
Title:United States, Petitioner
v.
Evelyn Sineneng-Smith
Docketed:July 12, 2019
Linked with 18A1117
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-10614)
   Decision Date:December 4, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:February 12, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 29 2019Application (18A1117) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 13, 2019 to June 12, 2019, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Apr 30 2019Application (18A1117) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until June 12, 2019.
May 31 2019Application (18A1117) to extend further the time from June 12, 2019 to July 12, 2019, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Written RequestProof of Service
May 31 2019Application (18A1117) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until July 12, 2019.
Jul 12 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 12, 2019)
PetitionProof of Service
Jul 18 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 12, 2019 to August 28, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 19 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 28, 2019.
Aug 28 2019Brief of respondent Evelyn Sineneng-Smith in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 10 2019Reply of petitioner United States filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Sep 11 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.
Oct 04 2019Petition GRANTED.
Oct 25 2019Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Nov 15 2019Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including December 2, 2019. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including January 15, 2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Attorneys for Respondent
Mark Christopher Fleming
    Counsel of Record
WilmerHale
60 State Street
Boston, MA 02109

mark.fleming@wilmerhale.com
6175266000
Party name: Evelyn Sineneng-Smith