No. 19-6684 | |
Title: | Rakeem Asaad Davis, Petitioner v. United States |
Docketed: | November 19, 2019 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (18-10140) |
Decision Date: | June 12, 2019 |
Rehearing Denied: | August 14, 2019 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Nov 12 2019 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 19, 2019) |
PetitionMotion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisProof of ServiceOther | |
Dec 19 2019 | Memorandum of respondent United States filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count | |
Jan 09 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/24/2020. |
Jan 27 2020 | Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Rehaif v. United States, 588 U. S. ___ (2019). |
Feb 28 2020 | JUDGMENT ISSUED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Jacqueline Esther Shapiro Counsel of Record | 40 NW Third Street PH 1 Miami, FL 33128 shapiro.miamilaw@gmail.com | 3054038207 |
Party name: Rakeem Davis | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Noel J. Francisco Counsel of Record | Solicitor General United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: United States |