No. 19-661
Title:Mynor Abdiel Tun-Cos, et al., Petitioners
v.
B. Perrotte, et al.
Docketed:November 22, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-1451)
   Decision Date:April 26, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:August 22, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 20 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 23, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 17 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 23, 2019 to January 22, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 18 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 22, 2020.
Jan 09 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 22, 2020 to February 21, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 10 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including February 21, 2020.
Feb 21 2020Brief of respondents B. Perrotte, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 10 2020Reply of petitioners Mynor Abdiel Tun-Cos, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 11 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/27/2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
David Meir Zionts
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burlington LLP
One City Center
850 Tenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20001

dzionts@cov.com
202-662-6000
Party name: Mynor Abdiel Tun-Cos, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: B. Perrotte, et al.