No. 19-648
Title:CACI Premier Technology, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Suhail Najim Abdulla Al Shimari, et al.
Docketed:November 19, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-1328)
   Decision Date:August 23, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:October 1, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 15 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 19, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 05 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, CACI Premier Technology, Inc.
Blanket Consent
Dec 17 2019Brief amicus curiae of DRI-The Voice of the Defense Bar filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 19 2019Brief amicus curiae of Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 19 2019Brief of respondents Suhail Najim Abdullah Al Shimari, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 07 2020Reply of petitioner CACI Premier Technology, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 08 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/24/2020.
Jan 27 2020The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Theodore B. Olson
    Counsel of Record
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20036

tolson@gibsondunn.com
(202) 955-8668
Party name: CACI Premier Technology, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondents
Baher Azmy
    Counsel of Record
Katherine Gallagher Center For Constitutional Rights
666 Broadway,7th Floor
New York, NY 10012

bazmy@ccrjustice.org
2126146464
Party name: Suhail Najim Abdullah Al Shimari, et al.
Other
Lawrence S. Ebner
    Counsel of Record
Capital Appellate Advocacy PLLC
1701 Pennsylvania Ave NW, Suite 200
Washington, DC 20006

lawrence.ebner@capitalappellate.com
202-729-6337
Party name: DRI-The Voice of the Defense Bar
Daniel L Russell Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burling LLP
One CityCenter
850 Tenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20001

DRussell@cov.com
202-662-5420
Party name: Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc.