No. 19-645
Title:Arizona, Petitioner
v.
Hector Sebastion Nunez-Diaz
Docketed:November 19, 2019
Linked with 19A385
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Arizona
   Case Numbers:(CR-18-0514-PR)
   Decision Date:July 16, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 03 2019Application (19A385) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 14, 2019 to November 14, 2019, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Oct 07 2019Application (19A385) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until November 14, 2019.
Nov 14 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 19, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 26 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 19, 2019 to January 20, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 29 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 21, 2020.
Dec 19 2019Brief amicus curiae of Landmark Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 17 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 21, 2020 to February 20, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 17 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including February 20, 2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Drew Curtis Ensign
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
2005 N. Central Avenue
Phoenix, AZ 85004

drew.ensign@azag.gov
602-542-5252
Party name: State of Arizona
Attorneys for Respondent
Michael B. Kimberly
    Counsel of Record
McDermott Will & Emery
500 North Capitol Street NW
Washington, DC 20001

mkimberly@mwe.com
(202) 756-8901
Party name: Hector Nunez-Diaz
Other
Michael James O'Neill
    Counsel of Record
Landmark Legal Foundation
19415 Deerfield Ave. Suite 312
Leesburg, VA 20176

mike@landmarklegal.org
703-554-6105
Party name: Landmark Legal Foundation