No. 19-64
Title:Heidi C. Lilley, Kia Sinclair, and Ginger M. Pierro, Petitioners
v.
New Hampshire
Docketed:July 12, 2019
Linked with 18A1074
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of New Hampshire
   Case Numbers:(2017-116)
   Decision Date:February 8, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 16 2019Application (18A1074) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 9, 2019 to July 8, 2019, submitted to Justice Breyer.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Apr 19 2019Application (18A1074) granted by Justice Breyer extending the time to file until July 8, 2019.
Jul 08 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 12, 2019)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 18 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Heidi Lilley, et al.
Blanket Consent
Aug 06 2019Waiver of right of respondent New Hampshire to respond filed.
Main Document
Aug 12 2019Brief amici curiae of Grab Them by the Ballot, Inc., Spencer Tunick, Christine Hallquist filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 21 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.
Sep 12 2019Response Requested. (Due October 15, 2019)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Eric Alan Isaacson
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Eric Alan Isaacson
6580 Avenida Mirola
La Jolla, CA 92037-6231

ericalanisaacson@icloud.com
858-263-9581
Party name: Heidi Lilley, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Daniel E. WillOffice of the New Hampshire Attorney General
33 Capitol Street
Concord, NH 03301

daniel.will@doj.nh.gov
603-271-1119
Party name: New Hampshire
Other
Charles Benjamin Nutley
    Counsel of Record
C. Benjamin Nutley, Attorney at Law
1055 E. Colorado Blvd.
Fifth Floor
Pasadena, CA 91106

nutley@zenlaw.com
310-654-3365
Party name: Grab Them by the Ballot, Inc., Spencer Tunick, Christine Hallquist