No. 19-638
Title:N. B. D., Petitioner
v.
Kentucky Cabinet for Health and Family Services
Docketed:November 18, 2019
Linked with 19A247
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Kentucky
   Case Numbers:(2018-SC-000592-DGE)
   Decision Date:June 13, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 30 2019Application (19A247) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 11, 2019 to October 11, 2019, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Sep 04 2019Application (19A247) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until October 11, 2019.
Sep 30 2019Application (19A247) to extend further the time from October 11, 2019 to November 8, 2019, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Written RequestProof of Service
Oct 01 2019Application (19A247) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until November 8, 2019.
Nov 08 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 18, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 17 2019Brief of respondent Kentucky Cabinet for Health and Family Services in opposition filed.
Certificate of Word CountProof of ServiceMain Document
Dec 18 2019Letter waiving the 14-day waiting period for the distribution of the petition under Rule 15.5 filed.
Main Document
Dec 23 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/10/2020.
Dec 23 2019Motion for leave to intervene as petitioner filed by Nelida Maribel Diaz Juarez. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 23 2019Reply of petitioners Diaz Juarez, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 13 2020Motion for leave to intervene as petitioner GRANTED.
Jan 13 2020The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Tejinder Singh
    Counsel of Record
Goldstein & Russel, P.C.
7475 Wisconsin Avenue
Suite 850
Bethesda, MD 20814

tsingh@goldsteinrussell.com
(202) 362-0636
Party name: Diaz Juarez, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Thomas Edison Edge
    Counsel of Record
Tom Edge, Attorney & Counselor at Law
319 York Street
Newport, KY 41071

tom@northernkylawoffice.com
8594917700
Party name: Kentucky Cabinet for Health and Family Services