No. 19-633
Title:Edwin Arthur Avery, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:November 15, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-3628)
   Decision Date:May 28, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:September 4, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 15 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 16, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 12 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 16, 2019 to January 15, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 13 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 15, 2020.
Jan 08 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 15, 2020 to January 29, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 09 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including January 29, 2020.
Jan 29 2020Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 12 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/28/2020.
Feb 12 2020Reply of petitioner Edwin Arthur Avery filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Thomas Gregory Sprankling
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
950 Page Mill Road
Palo Alto, CA 94304

Thomas.Sprankling@wilmerhale.com
650-858-6062
Party name: Edwin Arthur Avery
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States