No. 19-631
Title:William P. Barr, Attorney General, et al., Petitioners
v.
American Association of Political Consultants, Inc., et al.
Docketed:November 15, 2019
Linked with 19A271
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-1588)
   Decision Date:April 24, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:June 21, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 06 2019Application (19A271) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 19, 2019 to October 21, 2019, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 09 2019Application (19A271) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until October 21, 2019.
Oct 11 2019Application (19A271) to extend further the time from October 21, 2019 to November 18, 2019, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Written RequestProof of Service
Oct 15 2019Application (19A271) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until November 18, 2019.
Nov 14 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 16, 2019)
PetitionProof of Service
Dec 04 2019Brief of respondents American Association of Political Consultants, Inc., et al. in support filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 18 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/10/2020.
Dec 18 2019Reply of petitioners William P. Barr, Attorney General, et al. filed.
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
Jan 10 2020Petition GRANTED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: William P. Barr, Attorney General, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Roman Martinez V
    Counsel of Record
Latham & Watkins, LLP
555 Eleventh Street, NW
Washington, DC 20004

roman.martinez@lw.com
202-637-3377
Party name: American Association of Political Consultants, Inc., et al.