No. 19-623 | |
Title: | Shrinivas Sugandhalaya LLP, Petitioner v. Balkrishna Setty, et al. |
Docketed: | November 15, 2019 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (18-35573) |
Decision Date: | June 6, 2019 |
Rehearing Denied: | August 12, 2019 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Nov 12 2019 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 16, 2019) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceOther | |
Nov 27 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 16, 2019 to December 23, 2019, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Dec 03 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 23, 2019. |
Dec 23 2019 | Brief of respondents Balkrishna Setty and Sugandhalaya LLP, et al. in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Jan 08 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/24/2020. |
Jun 01 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/4/2020. |
Jun 08 2020 | Petition GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of GE Energy Power Conversion France SAS v. Outokumpu Stainless USA, LLC, 590 U. S. ___ (2020). |
Jul 10 2020 | JUDGMENT ISSUED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Brian William Esler Counsel of Record | Miller Nash Graham & Dunn LLP Pier 70, 2801 Alaskan Way, Suite 300 Seattle, WA 98121 brian.esler@millernash.com | 206-624-8300 |
Party name: Shrinivas Sugandhalaya LLP | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
Scott Samuel Brown Counsel of Record | Maynard Cooper & Gale PC 1901 6th Avenue North, Suite 2400 Birmingham, AL 35243 scottbrown@maynardcooper.com | 2052541232 |
Party name: Balkrishna Setty and Sugandhalaya LLP, et al. | ||
Scott S. Brown | Maynard Cooper & Gale PC 1901 6th Avenue North, Suite 2400 Birmingham, AL 35203 scottbrown@maynardcooper.com | (205) 254-1232 |
Party name: Balkrishna Setty and Sugandhalaya LLP |