No. 19-6220 | |
Title: | Nerses Nick Bronsozian, Petitioner v. United States |
Docketed: | October 9, 2019 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (17-50197) |
Decision Date: | April 15, 2019 |
Rehearing Denied: | July 10, 2019 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Oct 07 2019 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due November 8, 2019) |
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionProof of Service | |
Oct 31 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 8, 2019 to December 9, 2019, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Nov 04 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 9, 2019. |
Dec 05 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 9, 2019 to January 8, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Dec 06 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including January 8, 2020. |
Jan 07 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 8, 2020 to February 7, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Jan 08 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including February 7, 2020. |
Feb 05 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 7, 2020 to March 9, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Feb 07 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including March 9, 2020. |
Mar 09 2020 | Brief of respondent United States of America filed. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Mar 26 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/17/2020. |
Apr 20 2020 | Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of the pending application to vacate the judgment and dismiss the indictment. |
May 22 2020 | JUDGMENT ISSUED |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
John Lewis Littrell Counsel of Record | Bienert | Katzman PC 903 Calle Amanecer Suite 350 San Clemente, CA 92673 jlittrell@bienertkatzman.com | (949) 369-3700 |
Party name: Nerses Bronsozian | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Noel J. Francisco Counsel of Record | Solicitor General United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: United States of America |