No. 19-62
Title:Michelle Carter, Petitioner
v.
Massachusetts
Docketed:July 11, 2019
Linked with 18A1112
Lower Ct:Supreme Judicial Court of Massachusetts
   Case Numbers:(SCJ-12502)
   Decision Date:February 6, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 24 2019Application (18A1112) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 7, 2019 to July 6, 2019, submitted to Justice Breyer.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Apr 29 2019Application (18A1112) granted by Justice Breyer extending the time to file until July 8, 2019.
Jul 08 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 12, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 09 2019Waiver of right of respondent Commonwealth of Massachusetts to respond filed.
Main Document
Aug 14 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.
Aug 22 2019Response Requested. (Due September 23, 2019)
Sep 12 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 23, 2019 to November 22, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 17 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 22, 2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Daniel N. Marx
    Counsel of Record
Fick & Marx LLP
24 Federal Street, 4th Floor
Boston, MA 02110

dmarx@fickmarx.com
8573218360
Party name: Michelle Carter
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth Napier Dewar
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Massachusetts Attorney General
One Ashburton Place
Boston, MA 02108

bessie.dewar@mass.gov
617-963-2204
Party name: Commonwealth of Massachusetts