No. 19-619
Title:Cisco Systems, Inc., Petitioner
v.
SRI International, Inc.
Docketed:November 14, 2019
Linked with 19A312
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2017-2223)
   Decision Date:July 12, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 17 2019Application (19A312) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 10, 2019 to November 8, 2019, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 18 2019Application (19A312) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until November 8, 2019.
Nov 08 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 16, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 05 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 16, 2019 to January 15, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 09 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 15, 2020.
Jan 15 2020Brief of respondent SRI International, Inc. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
William F. Lee
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
60 State Street
Boston, MA 02109

William.Lee@wilmerhale.com
(617) 526-6000
Party name: Cisco Systems, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondent
Frank Everett Scherkenbach
    Counsel of Record
Fish and Richardson, P.C.
One Marina Park Drive
Boston, MA 02210-1878

scherkenbach@fr.com
617-521-7883
Party name: SRI International, Inc.