No. 19-609
Title:Erin J. Shepherd, et al., Petitioners
v.
Angela Studdard
Docketed:November 12, 2019
Linked with 19A771
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-5084)
   Decision Date:August 12, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 08 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 12, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 12 2019Brief of respondent Angela Studdard in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 27 2019Response of Angela Studdard to motion not accepted for filing. (January 17, 2020)
Dec 30 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/17/2020.
Jan 03 2020Reply of petitioners Erin Shepherd, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 07 2020Application (19A771) for a stay, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main Document
Jan 13 2020Application (19A771) denied by Justice Sotomayor.
Jan 16 2020Rescheduled.
Jan 21 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/24/2020.
Jan 22 2020Rescheduled.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
John Marshall Jones
    Counsel of Record
Shelby County (TN) Attorney's Office
160 North Main Street
Suite 950
Memphis, TN 38103

johnm.jones@shelbycountytn.gov
(901) 222-2126
Party name: Erin Shepherd, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Daniel A. Seward
    Counsel of Record
Seward Law Firm
4510 Chickasaw Road
Memphis, TN 38117

sewardlawfirm@aol.com
(901) 527-5500
Party name: Angela Studdard