No. 19-608
Title:Mark Elster, et al., Petitioners
v.
City of Seattle, Washington
Docketed:November 12, 2019
Linked with 19A345
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Washington
   Case Numbers:(96660-5)
   Decision Date:July 11, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 24 2019Application (19A345) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 9, 2019 to November 8, 2019, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 26 2019Application (19A345) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until November 8, 2019.
Nov 07 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 12, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 18 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioners, Mark Elster, et al.
Blanket ConsentProof of Service
Nov 20 2019Waiver of City of Seattle, Washington of right to respond not accepted for filing. (November 26, 2019)
Nov 20 2019Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, City of Seattle, Washington.
Blanket ConsentProof of Service
Nov 26 2019Waiver of right of respondent City of Seattle, Washington to respond filed.
Main Document
Dec 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/10/2020.
Dec 10 2019Response Requested. (Due January 9, 2020)
Dec 12 2019Brief amicus curiae of Goldwater Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 16 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 9, 2020 to February 10, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 18 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 10, 2020.
Jan 09 2020Brief amici curiae of American Association of Christian Schools, et al filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 09 2020Brief amicus curiae of Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Ethan Winfred Blevins
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
930 G Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

EBlevins@pacificlegal.org
9164197111
Party name: Mark Elster, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Roger D. Wynne
    Counsel of Record
Seattle City Attorney's Office
701 5th Ave.
Suite 2050
Seattle, WA 98104-7097

roger.wynne@seattle.gov
206-233-2177
Party name: City of Seattle, Washington
Other
John J. Bursch
    Counsel of Record
Alliance Defending Freedom
440 First Street NW
Suite 600
Washington, DC 20001

jbursch@adflegal.org
(616) 450-4235
Party name: American Association of Christian Schools, et al
Anthony Thomas Caso
    Counsel of Record
Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
One University Drive
Orange, CA 92866

caso@chapman.edu
877-855-3330
Party name: Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
Jacob H. Huebert
    Counsel of Record
Goldwater institute
500 E. Coronado Rd.
Phoenix, AZ 85004

jhuebert@goldwaterinstitute.org
6024625000
Party name: Goldwater Institute