No. 19-6062
Title:Priscilla Daydee Valdez, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:September 25, 2019
Linked with 19A13
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-10446)
   Decision Date:December 21, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:April 29, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 26 2019Application (19A13) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 28, 2019 to September 12, 2019, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 01 2019Application (19A13) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until September 12, 2019.
Aug 28 2019Application (19A13) to extend further the time from September 12, 2019 to September 23, 2019, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Written RequestProof of Service
Aug 31 2019Application (19A13) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until September 23, 2019.
Sep 23 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due October 25, 2019)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionProof of Service
Oct 02 2019Waiver of right of respondent United Staes of America to respond filed.
Main Document
Oct 10 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/1/2019.
Oct 16 2019Response Requested. (Due November 15, 2019)
Nov 06 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 15, 2019 to December 16, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 07 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 16, 2019.
Dec 04 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 16, 2019 to January 15, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 05 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including January 15, 2020.
Jan 09 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 15, 2020 to February 14, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 10 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including February 14, 2020.
Feb 14 2020Brief of respondent United Staes of America in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 28 2020Reply of petitioner Priscilla Daydee Valdez filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 05 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/20/2020.
Mar 23 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/27/2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Mary Edith Cunningham
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defenders Office
407 W. Congress Street
Suite 501
Tucson, AZ 85701

edie_cunningham@fd.org
5208797500
Party name: Priscilla Daydee Valdez
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United Staes of America