No. 19-605
Title:Arizona, Petitioner
v.
Philip John Martin
Docketed:November 12, 2019
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Arizona
   Case Numbers:(CR-18-0380-PR)
   Decision Date:August 9, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 07 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 12, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 04 2019Waiver of right of respondent Philip Martin to respond filed.
Main Document
Dec 18 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/10/2020.
Jan 06 2020Response Requested. (Due February 5, 2020)
Jan 09 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 5, 2020 to March 6, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 13 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 6, 2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Linley Sarah Wilson
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Arizona Attorney General
2005 N. Central Ave
Phoenix, AZ 85004

linley.wilson@azag.gov
6025425025
Party name: State of Arizona
Attorneys for Respondent
Sarah Elaine Harrington
    Counsel of Record
Goldstein & Russell, P.C.
7475 Wisconsin Avenue
Suite 850
Bethesda, MD 20814

sh@goldsteinrussell.com
202-362-0636
Party name: Philip Martin
Jill L. EvansMohave County Appellate Defender
316 N. 5th Street
Kingman, AZ 86402

jill.evans@mohavecounty.us
928-814-4557
Party name: Philip Martin