No. 19-604
Title:Ernest L. Francway, Jr., Petitioner
v.
Robert Wilkie, Secretary of Veterans Affairs
Docketed:November 8, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2018-2136)
   Decision Date:October 15, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 07 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 9, 2019)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 04 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 9, 2019 to January 8, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 04 2019Brief amicus curiae of National Law School Veterans Clinic Consortium filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 05 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 8, 2020.
Dec 09 2019Brief amicus curiae of Military-Veterans Advocacy Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 17 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 8, 2020 to February 7, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 18 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including February 7, 2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Michael E. Joffre
    Counsel of Record
Sterne, Kessler, Goldstein & Fox P.L.L.C.
1100 New York Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20005

mjoffre@sternekessler.com
202-772-8856
Party name: Ernest L. Francway, Jr.
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Robert Wilkie, Secretary of Veterans Affairs
Other
Melanie Lynn Bostwick
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
1152 15th Street NW
Washington, DC 20005

mbostwick@orrick.com
202-339-8483
Party name: Military-Veterans Advocacy Inc.
Angela K. Drake
    Counsel of Record
The Veterans Clinic at the University of Missouri-Columbia School of Law
120 Hulston Hall
Columbia, MO 65211-4300

drakea@missouri.edu
573-882-7630
Party name: National Law School Veterans Clinic Consortium