No. 19-603
Title:Mark Silguero, et al., Petitioners
v.
CSL Plasma, Incorporated
Docketed:November 7, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-41206)
   Decision Date:August 9, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 07 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 9, 2019)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 09 2019Brief amici curiae of Current and Former Members of Congress filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 09 2019Waiver of right of respondent CSL Plasma, Inc. to respond filed.
Main Document
Dec 18 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/10/2020.
Dec 23 2019Response Requested. (Due January 22, 2020)
Jan 22 2020Brief of respondent CSL Plasma, Inc. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 04 2020Reply of petitioners Mark Silguero, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 05 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/21/2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Sasha Minh Samberg-Champion
    Counsel of Record
Relman Colfax PLLC
1225 19th St., NW
Suite 600
Washington, DC 20036

ssamberg-champion@relmanlaw.com
2027281888
Party name: Mark Silguero, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Bruce J. Douglas
    Counsel of Record
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.
225 South Sixth Street, Suite 1800
Minneapolis, MN 55402

bruce.douglas@ogletree.com
612-336-6858
Party name: CSL Plasma, Inc.
Other
Pamela Susan Karlan
    Counsel of Record
Stanford Law School
Supreme Court Litigation Clinic
559 Nathan Abbott Way
Stanford, CA 94305

karlan@stanford.edu
650-725-4851
Party name: Curent and Former Members of Congress