No. 19-5990 | |
Title: | David Alan Vogel, Petitioner v. United States |
Docketed: | September 18, 2019 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (18-40925) |
Decision Date: | July 9, 2019 |
Rehearing Denied: | August 7, 2019 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Aug 27 2019 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due October 18, 2019) |
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service | |
Oct 08 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 18, 2019 to November 18, 2019, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Oct 09 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 18, 2019. |
Nov 18 2019 | Memorandum of respondent United States filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count | |
Nov 26 2019 | Reply of petitioner David Alan Vogel filed. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Dec 05 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/10/2020. |
Jun 01 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/4/2020. |
Jun 08 2020 | Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Banister v. Davis, 590 U. S. ___ (2020). |
Jul 10 2020 | JUDGMENT ISSUED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
David Alan Vogel | #09472049 FMC, Box 879 Ayer, ME 01432 | |
Party name: David Alan Vogel | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Noel J. Francisco Counsel of Record | Solicitor General United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: United States |