No. 19-587
Title:Jimmie Eugene White, II, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:November 5, 2019
Linked with 19A219
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-1009)
   Decision Date:April 10, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:June 5, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 22 2019Application (19A219) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 3, 2019 to November 1, 2019, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Aug 27 2019Application (19A219) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until November 1, 2019.
Nov 01 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 5, 2019)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 26 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 5, 2019 to January 6, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 27 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 6, 2020.
Jan 02 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 6, 2020 to February 5, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 03 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including February 5, 2020.
Jan 31 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 5, 2020 to March 6, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 31 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including March 6, 2020.
Mar 06 2020Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Mar 24 2020Reply of petitioner Jimmie Eugene White, II filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 25 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/17/2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
John Patrick Elwood
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
601 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

john.elwood@arnoldporter.com
(202) 942-5992
Party name: Jimmie Eugene White, II
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States