No. 19-583
Title:Estate of Robert Cunningham, et al., Petitioners
v.
Mark McGuire
Docketed:November 5, 2019
Linked with 19A189
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-1106)
   Decision Date:May 6, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:May 31, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 16 2019Application (19A189) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 29, 2019 to September 27, 2019, submitted to Justice Breyer.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Aug 20 2019Application (19A189) granted by Justice Breyer extending the time to file until September 27, 2019.
Sep 12 2019Application (19A189) to extend further the time from September 27, 2019 to October 25, 2019, submitted to Justice Breyer.
Written RequestProof of Service
Sep 13 2019Application (19A189) granted by Justice Breyer extending the time to file until October 25, 2019.
Oct 25 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 5, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Tejinder Singh
    Counsel of Record
Goldstein & Russell, P.C.
7475 Wisconsin Avenue
Suite 850
Bethesda, MD 20814

tsingh@goldsteinrussell.com
2023620636
Party name: Estate of Robert Cunningham, et al.