No. 19-5807
Title:Thedrick Edwards, Petitioner
v.
Darrel Vannoy, Warden
Docketed:September 4, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-31095)
   Decision Date:May 20, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 15 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due October 4, 2019)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Sep 30 2019Waiver of right of respondent Darrel, Warden, Louisiana State Penitentiary Vannoy to respond filed.
Main Document
Oct 03 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/18/2019.
Oct 11 2019Response Requested. (Due November 12, 2019)
Nov 05 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 12, 2019 to December 12, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 08 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 12, 2019.
Dec 12 2019Brief of respondent Darrel, Warden, Louisiana State Penitentiary Vannoy in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Dec 30 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/17/2020.
Apr 20 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/24/2020.
Apr 27 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/1/2020.
May 04 2020Motion to proceed in forma pauperis GRANTED. Petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED limited to the following question: Whether this Court’s decision in Ramos v. Louisiana, 590 U. S. ___ (2020), applies retroactively to cases on federal collateral review.
May 19 2020Joint motion of the parties for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
May 28 2020Joint motion of the parties to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted in part. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including July 15, 2020. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including September 14, 2020. The reply brief is to be filed in compliance with Rule 25.3.
Jul 09 2020Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Thedrick Edwards.
Blanket ConsentProof of Service
Jul 13 2020Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Darrel, Warden, Louisiana State. Penitentiary Vannoy
Blanket Consent
Jul 15 2020Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Main Document
Jul 15 2020Brief of petitioner Thedrick Edwards filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 21 2020Brief amici curiae of Center on Race, Inequality, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 21 2020Brief amici curiae of Human Rights for Kids and Louisiana Center for Children’s Rights filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 21 2020Brief amici curiae of The Promise of Justice Initiative, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 21 2020Brief amici curiae of Louisiana Professors of Law filed.
Main DocumentOtherProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 21 2020Brief amici curiae of Jonathan F. Mitchell and Adam K. Mortara in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 22 2020Brief amicus curiae of NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 22 2020Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 22 2020Brief amici curiae of American Civil Liberties Union, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 22 2020Brief amicus curiae of DKT Liberty Project filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 22 2020Brief amici curiae of Roderick & Solange MacArthur Justice Center and Phillips Black, Inc., in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 22 2020Brief amicus curiae of Law Professors and Social Scientists filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 22 2020Brief amici curiae of Edward L. Tarpley, Jr., et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 22 2020Brief amici curiae of Federal Public Defender for the District of Oregon and the Oregon Criminal Defense Lawyers Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 22 2020Brief amicus curiae of Innocence Project New Orleans filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 22 2020Brief amici curiae of Former Judges, Prosecutors, and Public Officials filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 22 2020Brief amicus curiae of JonRe Taylor filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 22 2020Brief amici curiae of Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Andre Robert Belanger
    Counsel of Record
Manasseh, Gill, Knipe & Belanger
8075 Jefferson Highway
Baton Rouge, LA 70809

andre@manassehandgill.com
225-383-9703
Party name: Thedrick Edwards
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth Baker Murrill
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
P.O. Box 94005
Baton Rouge, LA 70084-9005

murrille@ag.louisiana.gov
225-326-6766
Party name: Darrel, Warden, Louisiana State Penitentiary Vannoy
Other
Allison A. Davis
    Counsel of Record
Davis Wright Tremaine LLP
505 Montgomery Street
Suite 800
San Francisco, CA 94111

allisondavis@dwt.com
415 276 6500
Party name: Edward L. Tarpley, Jr., et al.
Jessica Ring Amunson
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
1099 New York Avenue NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

JAmunson@jenner.com
202-639-6023
Party name: DKT Liberty Project
Lisa Schiavo Blatt
    Counsel of Record
Williams & Connolly LLP
725 12th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

lblatt@wc.com
202-434-5050
Party name: American Civil Liberties Union, et al.
Bennett L. Cohen
    Counsel of Record
Polsinelli, PC
1401 Eye (“I”) Street, N.W.
Suite 800
Washington, DC 20005

bcohen@polsinelli.com
(202) 783-3300
Party name: Human Rights for Kids and Louisiana Center for Children’s Rights
G. Ben Cohen
    Counsel of Record
The Promise of Justice Initiative
1024 Elysian Fields
New Orleans, LA 70117

bcohen@defendla.org
504-529-5955
Party name: The Promise of Justice Initiative, et al.
Richard Martin Andrew Davis
    Counsel of Record
Innocence Project New Orleans
4051 Ulloa Street
New Orleans, LA 70119

richardd@ip-no.org
5049431902
Party name: Innocence Project New Orleans
Michael R. Dreeben
    Counsel of Record
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
1625 Eye Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

mdreeben@omm.com
202-383-5300
Party name: Former Judges, Prosecutors, and Public Officials
Laura G. Ferguson
    Counsel of Record
Miller & Chevalier Chartered
900 Sixteenth street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

lferguson@milchev.com
(202) 626-5567
Party name: National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers
Thomas Frampton
    Counsel of Record
University of Virginia School of Law
580 Massie Road
Charlottesville, VA 22903

tframpton@law.virginia.edu
202-352-8341
Party name: Jonre Taylor
Matthew Owen Gatewood
    Counsel of Record
Eversheds Sutherland (US) LLP
700 Sixth Street, NW
Suite 700
Washington, DC 20001

mattgatewood@eversheds-sutherland.com
(202) 383-0122
Party name: Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law
Brianne Jenna Gorod
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

brianne@theusconstitution.org
202 296 6889
Party name: Law Professors and Social Scientists
Adam Karl Mortara
    Counsel of Record
Bartlit Beck LLP
54 W. Hubbard Street
Chicago, IL 60654

adam.mortara@bartlitbeck.com
312 494-4400
Party name: Jonathan F. Mitchell and Adam K. Mortara
Devi Maheswari Rao
    Counsel of Record
Roderick & Solange MacArthur Justice Center (Washington, DC)
777 6th Street NW
11th Floor
Washington, DC 20001

devi.rao@macarthurjustice.org
2028693434
Party name: Roderick & Solange MacArthur Justice Center and Phillips Black, Inc.
Stephen Reese Sady
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender for the District of Oregon
101 SW Main Street
Suite 1700
Portland, OR 97204

steve_sady@fd.org
503-326-2123
Party name: Federal Public Defender for the District of Oregon and the Oregon Criminal Defense Lawyers Association
Vincent Michael Southerland
    Counsel of Record
Center on Race, Inequality, and the Law at New York University School of Law
139 MacDougal Street
Suite 416
NEW YORK, NY 10012

vincent.southerland@nyu.edu
(212) 998-6882
Party name: Center on Race, Inequality, et al.
Samuel Spital
    Counsel of Record
NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc.
40 Rector St.
5th Floor
New York, NY 10006

sspital@naacpldf.org
(212) 965-2200
Party name: NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc.