No. 19-58
Title:Xitronix Corporation, Petitioner
v.
KLA-Tencor Corporation, dba KLA-Tencor, Inc.
Docketed:July 10, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2016-2746)
   Decision Date:May 23, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 10 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 9, 2019)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 05 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 9, 2019 to August 23, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 07 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 23, 2019.
Aug 23 2019Brief of respondent KLA-Tencor Corporation, DBA KLA-Tencor, Inc. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 05 2019Reply of petitioner Xitronix Corporation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 11 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Adam G. Unikowsky
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
1099 New York Avenue, NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

AUnikowsky@jenner.com
202-639-6041
Party name: Xitronix Corporation
Attorneys for Respondent
Aaron Gabriel Fountain
    Counsel of Record
DLA Piper LLP (US)
401 Congress Avenue, Ste 2500
Austin, TX 78701

aaron.fountain@us.dlapiper.com
5124577190
Party name: KLA-Tencor Corporation, DBA KLA-Tencor, Inc.