No. 19-574
Title:Sheila J. Poole, Commissioner, New York State Office of Children and Family Services, Petitioner
v.
New York State Citizens' Coalition for Children
Docketed:November 1, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(14-2919)
   Decision Date:April 19, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:August 16, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 30 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 2, 2019)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 21 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 2, 2019 to January 2, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 22 2019Response to motion for an extension of time from petitioner Sheila Poole filed.
Main Document
Nov 22 2019Reply in support of motion filed.
Main Document
Nov 22 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 2, 2020.
Dec 02 2019Brief amicus curiae of State of Connecticut filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Barbara Dale Underwood
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Attorney General
28 Liberty Street
New York, NY 10005-1400

Barbara.underwood@ag.ny.gov
212-416-8016
Party name: Sheila Poole
Attorneys for Respondent
Brian Robert Matsui
    Counsel of Record
Morrison & Foerster LLP
2000 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

bmatsui@mofo.com
202-887-8784
Party name: New York State Citizens' Coalition for Children
Other
Clare Elmendorf Kindall
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
165 Capitol Avenue
Hartford, CT 06106

Clare.Kindall@ct.gov
860-808-5261
Party name: State of Connecticut