No. 19-569 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Carlos Manuel Ayestas, Petitioner
v.
Lorie Davis, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division
Docketed:October 30, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-70015)
   Decision Date:July 31, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 29 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 29, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 19 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 29, 2019 to January 13, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 21 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 13, 2020.
Jan 13 2020Brief of respondent Lorie Davis, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice (Institutional Division) in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 28 2020Reply of petitioner Carlos Manuel Ayestas filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 29 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/21/2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Meaghan Elizabeth McLaine VerGow
    Counsel of Record
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
1625 Eye Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

mvergow@omm.com
(202)-383-5300
Party name: Carlos Manuel Ayestas
Attorneys for Respondent
Kyle Douglas Hawkins
    Counsel of Record
Texas Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

kyle.hawkins@oag.texas.gov
5129361700
Party name: Lorie Davis, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice (Institutional Division)