No. 19-566 | |
Title: | Devan Pierson, Petitioner v. United States |
Docketed: | October 30, 2019 |
Linked with 19A142 | |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (18-1112) |
Decision Date: | May 31, 2019 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Aug 05 2019 | Application (19A142) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 29, 2019 to September 28, 2019, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh. |
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | |
Aug 05 2019 | Application (19A142) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until September 28, 2019. |
Sep 05 2019 | Application (19A142) to extend further the time from September 28, 2019 to October 28, 2019, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh. |
Written RequestProof of Service | |
Sep 06 2019 | Application (19A142) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until October 28, 2019. |
Oct 28 2019 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 29, 2019) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Nov 20 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 29, 2019 to December 30, 2019, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Nov 21 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 30, 2019. |
Dec 18 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 30, 2019 to January 30, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Dec 19 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including January 30, 2020. |
Jan 30 2020 | Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. |
Proof of ServiceMain Document | |
Feb 18 2020 | Reply of petitioner Devan Pierson filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Feb 19 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/6/2020. |
Mar 09 2020 | Petition GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Rehaif v. United States, 588 U. S. ___ (2019). |
Apr 10 2020 | JUDGMENT ISSUED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Erin E. Murphy Counsel of Record | Kirkland & Ellis LLP 1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20004 erin.murphy@kirkland.com | (202) 389-5000 |
Party name: Devan Pierson | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Noel J. Francisco Counsel of Record | Solicitor General United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: United States |