No. 19-565
Title:Antonio Passaro, Jr., Petitioner
v.
Virginia, et al.
Docketed:October 30, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-1789)
   Decision Date:August 16, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:September 16, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 29 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 29, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 04 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 29, 2019 to December 30, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 06 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 30, 2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Pratik Arvind Shah
    Counsel of Record
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld, LLP
2001 K Street N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

pshah@akingump.com
202-887-4210
Party name: Antonio Passaro, Jr.
Attorneys for Respondents
Toby Jay Heytens
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
202 North Ninth Street
Richmond, VA 23219

SolicitorGeneral@oag.state.va.us
(804) 786-7240
Party name: Commonwealth of Virginia, et al.