No. 19-564
Title:Michigan, Petitioner
v.
Eric Lamontee Beck
Docketed:October 29, 2019
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Michigan
   Case Numbers:(152934)
   Decision Date:July 29, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 23 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 29, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 19 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 29, 2019 to December 30, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 21 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 30, 2019.
Dec 30 2019Brief of respondent Eric L. Beck in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Dec 30 2019Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent Eric L. Beck.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 15 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/21/2020.
Feb 14 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/21/2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Heidi Michelle Williams
    Counsel of Record
Saginaw County Prosecutor's Office
111 South Michigan Avenue
Saginaw, MI 48602

hwilliams@saginawcounty.com
989-482-6907
Party name: Michigan
Attorneys for Respondent
Jeffrey L. Fisher
    Counsel of Record
Stanford Law School Supreme Court Clinic
559 Nathan Abbott Way
Stanford, CA 94305

jlfisher@law.stanford.edu
(650) 724-7081
Party name: Eric L. Beck