No. 19-563
Vide 19-422
Title:Steven T. Mnuchin, Secretary of the Treasury, et al., Petitioners
v.
Patrick J. Collins, et al.
Docketed:October 29, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-20364)
   Decision Date:September 6, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 25 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 29, 2019)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 27 2019Brief of respondents Patrick J. Collins, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 27 2019Brief amici curiae of Bryndon Fisher, Bruce Reid, & Erick Shipmon in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 11 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/10/2020.
Dec 11 2019Reply of petitioners Steven T. Mnuchin, Secretary of the Treasury, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentMain Document
Jun 29 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 7/1/2020.
Jul 08 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 7/8/2020.
Jul 09 2020Petition GRANTED. The petition for a writ of certiorari in No. 19-422 is granted. The cases are consolidated, and a total of one hour is allotted for oral argument. VIDED.
Jul 09 2020Because the Court has consolidated these cases for briefing and oral argument, future filings and activity in the cases will now be reflected on the docket of No. 19-422. Subsequent filings in these cases must therefore be submitted through the electronic filing system in No. 19-422. Each document submitted in connection with one or more of these cases must include on its cover the case number and caption for each case in which the filing is intended to be submitted. Where a filing is submitted in fewer than all of the cases, the docket entry will reflect the case number(s) in which the filing is submitted; a document filed in all of the consolidated cases will be noted as “VIDED.”
Aug 17 2020Aaron Nielson, Esquire, of Provo, Utah, is invited to brief and argue, as amicus curiae, in support of the position that the structure of the Federal Housing Finance Agency does not violate the separation of powers. VIDED.
Aug 18 2020Mnuchin, et al., shall file an opening brief on the questions presented by the petition in No. 19-563, limited to 13,000 words, by Monday, August 17, 2020. Collins, et al., shall file a consolidated response in No. 19-563 and opening brief in No. 19-422, limited to 20,000 words, by Wednesday, September 16, 2020. That brief shall bear a light red cover. The Court-appointed amicus curiae shall file a brief, limited to 13,000 words, by Friday, October 16, 2020. That brief shall bear a dark green cover. Mnuchin, et al., shall file a consolidated reply and response brief, limited to 13,000 words, by Friday, October 23, 2020. Collins, et al., shall file a consolidated reply and response brief to brief of Court-appointed amicus curiae, limited to 6,000 words, by Monday, November 23, 2020. That brief shall bear a tan cover. The brief of any amicus curiae in support of Collins, et al., or in support of neither set of parties, shall be filed by Wednesday, September 23, 2020. Those briefs shall bear a light green cover. The brief of any amicus curiae in support of Mnuchin, et al., or in support of Court-appointed amicus curiae, shall be filed by Friday, October 30, 2020. Those briefs shall bear a dark green cover. VIDED.
Sep 16 2020SET FOR ARGUMENT on Wednesday, December 9, 2020. VIDED.
Oct 08 2020Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 5th Circuit.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Steven T. Mnuchin, Secretary of the Treasury
Attorneys for Respondents
Charles Justin Cooper
    Counsel of Record
Cooper & Kirk, PLLC
1523 New Hampshire Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

ccooper@cooperkirk.com
202-220-9600
Party name: Patrick J. Collins, et al.
Other
Matthew P. Cavedon
    Counsel of Record
P.O. Box 390
Gainesville, GA 30503

mcavedon@post.harvard.edu
8605389130
Party name: Scholars in Support of Patrick J. Collins
Jason Alan Levine
    Counsel of Record
Alston & Bird LLP
950 F Street, NW
Washington, DC 20004

jason.levine@alston.com
2022393039
Party name: Timothy Howard
Aaron Lloyd Nielson
    Counsel of Record
J. Reuben Clark Law School
Brigham Young University
516 JRCB
Provo, UT 84602

nielsona@law.byu.edu
202-758-5237
Party name: Court Appointed Amicus Curiae
Robert Carter Schubert
    Counsel of Record
Schubert Jonckheer & Kolbe LLP
Three Embarcadero Center
San Francisco, CA 94111

rschubert@sjk.law
415-788-4220
Party name: Bryndon Fisher, Bruce Reid, & Erick Shipmon