No. 19-557
Title:Cedric L. McDonald, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:October 29, 2019
Linked with 19A191
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Armed Forces
   Case Numbers:(18-0308/AR)
   Decision Date:April 17, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:May 29, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 06 2019Application (19A191) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 27, 2019 to October 26, 2019, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Aug 19 2019Application (19A191) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until October 26, 2019.
Oct 28 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 29, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 01 2019Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Nov 13 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/6/2019.
Nov 21 2019Response Requested. (Due December 23, 2019)
Nov 22 2019Brief amicus curiae of U.S. Army Trial Defense Service filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 17 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 23, 2019 to January 22, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 18 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 22, 2020.
Jan 03 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 22, 2020 to February 21, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 06 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including February 21, 2020.
Feb 21 2020Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 10 2020Reply of petitioner McDonald filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 11 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/27/2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Steven Joseph Dray
    Counsel of Record
United States Army Judge Advocate General's Corps
9275 Gunston Rd.
Fort Belvoir, VA 22060

draysj@gmail.com
7167258779
Party name: McDonald
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Timothy Grammel
    Counsel of Record
9275 Gunston Road
Fort Belvoir, VA 22060

timothy.grammel.civ@mail.mil
2704985343
Party name: U.S. Army Trial Defense Service