No. 19-5561 *** CAPITAL CASE *** | |
Title: | Stephen Michael West, Petitioner v. Tony Parker, Commissioner, Tennessee Department of Correction, et al. |
Docketed: | August 12, 2019 |
Linked with 19A161 | |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (19-5585) |
Decision Date: | August 6, 2019 |
Rehearing Denied: | August 9, 2019 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Aug 12 2019 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due September 11, 2019) |
PetitionAppendixMotion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisProof of Service | |
Aug 12 2019 | Application (19A161) for a stay of execution of sentence of death, submitted to Justice Sotomayor. |
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/Opinions | |
Aug 13 2019 | Response of Tony Parker, et al. to application not accepted for filing. (September 05, 2019) |
Aug 13 2019 | Brief of respondents Tony Parker, et al. in opposition filed. |
Main Document | |
Aug 14 2019 | Reply of petitioner Stephen West filed. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Aug 14 2019 | Reply of applicant Stephen West filed. |
ReplyProof of Service | |
Aug 15 2019 | Application (19A161) referred to the Court. |
Aug 15 2019 | Petition DENIED. |
Aug 15 2019 | Application (19A161) denied by the Court. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Stephen Michael Kissinger Counsel of Record | Federal Defender Services of Eastern Tennessee 800 S. Gay Street Suite 2400 Knoxville, TN 37929 Stephen_Kissinger@fd.org | 8656377979 |
Party name: Stephen West | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
Sarah Keeton Campbell Counsel of Record | Tennessee Office of the Attorney General War Memorial Building 301 6th Avenue North Nashville, TN 37243 Sarah.Campbell@ag.tn.gov | (615) 532-6026 |
Party name: Tony Parker, et al. |