No. 19-5501 | |
Title: | Mandrail Jamar Woodberry, Petitioner v. United States |
Docketed: | August 7, 2019 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (18-4472) |
Decision Date: | March 11, 2019 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Jul 19 2019 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due September 6, 2019) |
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service | |
Aug 28 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 6, 2019 to October 7, 2019, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Aug 30 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 7, 2019. |
Oct 07 2019 | Memorandum of respondent United States filed. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Oct 24 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/8/2019. |
Nov 12 2019 | Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Rehaif v. United States, 588 U. S. ___ (2019). |
Dec 16 2019 | JUDGMENT ISSUED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Mandrail Jamar Woodberry | #341-23-057 P.O. Box 305 Jonesville, VA 24263 | |
Party name: Mandrail Jamar Woodberry | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Noel J. Francisco Counsel of Record | Solicitor General United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: United States |