No. 19-549
Title:Hannah P., Petitioner
v.
Joseph Maguire, Acting Director, Office of the Director of National Intelligence
Docketed:October 29, 2019
Linked with 19A307
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-1943)
   Decision Date:February 19, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:June 25, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 13 2019Application (19A307) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 23, 2019 to October 23, 2019, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Sep 18 2019Application (19A307) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until October 23, 2019.
Oct 23 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 29, 2019)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 13 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 29, 2019 to December 30, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 14 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 30, 2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Mark Thomas Stancil
    Counsel of Record
Robbins, Russell, Englert, Orseck, Untereiner & Sauber LLP
2000 K Street, NW
4th Floor
Washington, DC 20006

mstancil@robbinsrussell.com
202-775-4520
Party name: Hannah P.
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States