No. 19-547
Title:United States Fish and Wildlife Service, et al., Petitioners
v.
Sierra Club, Inc.
Docketed:October 28, 2019
Linked with 19A185
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-16560)
   Decision Date:May 30, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 16 2019Application (19A185) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 28, 2019 to September 27, 2019, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 19 2019Application (19A185) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until September 27, 2019.
Sep 17 2019Application (19A185) to extend further the time from September 27, 2019 to October 25, 2019, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Written RequestProof of Service
Sep 17 2019Application (19A185) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until October 25, 2019.
Oct 25 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 27, 2019)
PetitionCertificate of Word Count
Nov 01 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 27, 2019 to January 6, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 06 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 6, 2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States Fish and Wildlife Service,, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Sanjay Narayan
    Counsel of Record
Sierra Club Environmental Law Program
2101 Webster Street
Suite 1300
Oakland, CA 94612

sanjay.narayan@sierraclub.org
4159775769
Party name: Sierra Club, Inc.