No. 19-546
Title:Douglas Brownback, et al., Petitioners
v.
James King
Docketed:October 28, 2019
Linked with 19A184
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-2101)
   Decision Date:February 25, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:May 28, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 16 2019Application (19A184) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 26, 2019 to September 25, 2019, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 18 2019Application (19A184) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until September 25, 2019.
Sep 13 2019Application (19A184) to extend further the time from September 25, 2019 to October 25, 2019, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Written RequestProof of Service
Sep 16 2019Application (19A184) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until October 25, 2019.
Oct 25 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 27, 2019)
PetitionProof of Service
Nov 06 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 27, 2019 to January 22, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 08 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 22, 2020.
Jan 21 2020Brief of respondent James King in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 05 2020Reply of petitioners Douglas Brownback, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 26 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/20/2020.
Mar 23 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/27/2020.
Mar 30 2020Petition GRANTED.
Apr 09 2020Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Apr 21 2020Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioners' brief on the merits is extended to and including June 19, 2020. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including August 24, 2020.
Jun 19 2020Joint appendix filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Jun 19 2020Brief of petitioners Douglas Brownback, et al. filed.
Certificate of Word CountMain Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Douglas Brownback, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Patrick Michael Jaicomo
    Counsel of Record
Institute for Justice
901 North Glebe Road
Arlington, VA 22203

pjaicomo@ij.org
703.682.9320
Party name: James King