No. 19-5410
Title:Charles Borden, Jr., Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:July 31, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-5409)
   Decision Date:April 25, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 24 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due August 30, 2019)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 20 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 30, 2019 to September 30, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 21 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 30, 2019.
Sep 24 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 30, 2019 to October 21, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 25 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including October 21, 2019.
Sep 25 2019Supplemental brief of petitioner Charles Borden, Jr. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 21 2019Response to petition from respondent United States of America filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Oct 29 2019Waiver of the 14-day waiting period under 15.5 filed.
Main Document
Oct 31 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/15/2019.
Nov 07 2019Rescheduled.
Dec 30 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/17/2020.
Jan 23 2020Letter of petitioner Charles Borden, Jr. filed.
Main Document
Feb 14 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/21/2020.
Feb 24 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/28/2020.
Mar 02 2020Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED limited to Question 1 presented by the petition.
Mar 05 2020Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Mar 16 2020Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including April 27, 2020. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including June 8, 2020.
Mar 22 2020Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner Charles Borden, Jr.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Apr 20 2020Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner GRANTED.
Apr 27 2020Brief of petitioner Charles Borden, Jr. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 30 2020Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Charles Borden, Jr.
Blanket Consent
May 04 2020Brief amici curiae of Law Professors Leah Litman, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 04 2020Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 04 2020Brief amicus curiae of Americans for Prosperity Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 04 2020Brief amici curiae of Immigrant Rights Organizations filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 04 2020Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Federal Defenders filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 04 2020Brief amicus curiae of FAMM filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 08 2020Brief of respondent United States of America filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Jun 15 2020Brief amicus curiae of Criminal Justice Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 08 2020Reply of petitioner Charles Borden, Jr. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 19 2020SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, November 3, 2020.
Aug 31 2020Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 6th Circuit.
Sep 02 2020CIRCULATED

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Erin Phillippi Rust
    Counsel of Record
Federal Defender Services
835 Georgia Ave
Suite 600
Chattanooga, TN 37402

erin_rust@fd.org
(423) 756-4349
Party name: Charles Borden, Jr.
Attorneys for Respondent
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America
Other
Kent S. Scheidegger
    Counsel of Record
Criminal Justice Legal Fdtn.
2131 L Street
Sacramento, CA 95816

briefs@cjlf.org
9164460345
Party name: Criminal Justice Legal Foundation
David A. Barrett
    Counsel of Record
Boies Schiller Flexner LLP
55 Hudson Yards
New York, NY 10001

dbarrett@bsfllp.com
212-446-2300
Party name: National Association of Federal Defenders
Ishan Kharshedji Bhabha
    Counsel of Record
Jenner and Block LLP
1099 New York Ave NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

IBhabha@jenner.com
202-637-6327
Party name: National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers
David John Debold
    Counsel of Record
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20036

ddebold@gibsondunn.com
202-955-8551
Party name: FAMM
Rex S. Heinke
    Counsel of Record
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld, LLP
1999 Avenue of the Stars, Suite 600
Los Angeles, CA 90067

rheinke@akingump.com
3102291030
Party name: Immigrant Rights Organizations
Jeffrey Alan Lamken
    Counsel of Record
MoloLamken LLP
The Watergate, Suite 500
600 New Hampshire Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20037

jlamken@mololamken.com
2025562010
Party name: Law Professors Leah Litman et al.
Ryan Patrick Mulvey
    Counsel of Record
Americans for Prosperity Foundation
1310 North Courthouse Road
Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22201

rmulvey@afphq.org
(571) 444-2841
Party name: Americans for Prosperity Foundation