No. 19-541
Title:Michael Lambert, Petitioner
v.
Estate of Kevin Brown, by its Successor in Interest Rebecca Brown, et al.
Docketed:October 24, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-55930)
   Decision Date:July 24, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 21 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 25, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 25 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 25, 2019 to December 26, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 29 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 26, 2019.
Dec 26 2019Brief of respondents Estate of Kevin Brown, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 09 2020Reply of petitioner Michael Lambert filed.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Jan 15 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/21/2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Catherine Ann Richardson
    Counsel of Record
SAN DIEGO CITY ATTORNEY'S OFFICE
1200 THIRD AVENUE, SUITE 1100
SAN DIEGO, CA 92101

crichardson@sandiego.gov
6195334713
Party name: Michael Lambert
Attorneys for Respondents
Eugene G. Iredale
    Counsel of Record
Iredale and Yoo, APC
105 West F St. 4th Floor
San Diego, CA 92101

egiredale@iredalelaw.com
6192331525
Party name: Estate of Kevin Brown, et al.