No. 19-54
Title:Karolyn Givens, et al., Petitioners
v.
Mountain Valley Pipeline, LLC
Docketed:July 9, 2019
Linked with 18A1211
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-1175, 18-1187, 18-1242, 18-1300)
   Decision Date:February 4, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:March 5, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 20 2019Application (18A1211) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 3, 2019 to July 3, 2019, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
May 24 2019Application (18A1211) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until July 3, 2019.
Jul 03 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 8, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 26 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 8, 2019 to August 29, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 31 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 29, 2019.
Aug 06 2019Brief amici curiae of Owners' Counsel of America, PennEast NJ Property Owners, Institute for Justice, Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountCertificate of Word Count
Aug 08 2019Brief amici curiae of Public Law Scholars and Concerned Landowners filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 08 2019Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by The Niskanen Center.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 22 2019Brief of respondent Mountain Valley Pipeline, LLC in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 06 2019Reply of petitioners Karolyn Givens, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 11 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Christopher Stephen Johns
    Counsel of Record
Johns & Counsel PLLC
14101 Highway 290 West, Suite 400A
Austin, TX 78737

cjohns@johnsandcounsel.com
5123993150
Party name: Karolyn Givens, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Colin Emmet Wrabley
    Counsel of Record
Reed Smith LLP
225 Fifth Avenue
Pittsburgh, PA 15222

cwrabley@reedsmith.com
412-288-3548
Party name: Mountain Valley Pipeline, LLC
Other
Nancie G. Marzulla
    Counsel of Record
Marzulla Law, LLC
1150 Connecticut Ave. NW
Suite 1050
Washington, DC 20036

Nancie@marzulla.com
(202) 822-6760
Party name: THE NISKANEN CENTER
Robert H. Thomas
    Counsel of Record
Damon Key Leong Kupchak Hastert
1003 Bishop Street
1600 Pauahi Tower
Honolulu, HI 96813-0000

rht@hawaiilawyer.com
808-531-8031
Party name: Owners' Counsel of America, PennEast NJ Property Owners, Institute for Justice, Cato Institute
Ernest A. Young
    Counsel of Record
3208 Fox Terrace Drive.
Apex, NC 27502

young@law.duke.edu
9193607718
Party name: Public Law Scholars and Concerned Landowners