No. 19-539
Title:Office of Recovery Services, Petitioner
v.
John R. Latham
Docketed:October 24, 2019
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Utah
   Case Numbers:(20170556)
   Decision Date:August 22, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 21 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 25, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 08 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 25, 2019 to December 6, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 12 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 6, 2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Tyler Green
    Counsel of Record
Utah Solicitor General
350 N. State Street, Suite 230
Salt Lake City, UT 84114-2320

tylergreen@agutah.gov
(801) 538-9600
Party name: Office of Recovery Services
Attorneys for Respondent
Ishan Kharshedji Bhabha
    Counsel of Record
Jenner and Block LLP
1099 New York Ave NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

IBhabha@jenner.com
202-637-6327
Party name: John R. Latham