No. 19-534
Title:Lahim Kadria, Petitioner
v.
William P. Barr, Attorney General
Docketed:October 23, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-454, 19-954)
   Decision Date:July 23, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 21 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 22, 2019)
Oct 21 2019Pursuant to Rule 34.6 and Paragraph 9 of the Guidelines for the Submission of Documents to the Supreme Court''s Electronic Filing System, filings in this case should be submitted in paper form only, and shouild not be submitted throuigh the Court's electronic filing system.
Nov 13 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 22, 2019 to December 23, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Nov 14 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 23, 2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jerome Philippe Mayer-Cantu4287 Gilbert Street
Oakland, CA 94611

jmayercantu@gmail.com
(415) 530-6444
Party name: Lahim Kadria
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Barr, William