No. 19-532
Title:United States, Petitioner
v.
California, et al.
Docketed:October 23, 2019
Linked with 19A295
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-16496)
   Decision Date:April 18, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:June 26, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 13 2019Application (19A295) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 24, 2019 to October 24, 2019, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Sep 14 2019Application (19A295) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until October 24, 2019.
Oct 22 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 22, 2019)
PetitionProof of Service
Nov 05 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 22, 2019 to December 23, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 07 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 23, 2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Attorneys for Respondents
Aimee Athena Feinberg
    Counsel of Record
California Department of Justice
1300 I Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

Aimee.Feinberg@doj.ca.gov
916-210-6003
Party name: State of California, et al.