No. 19-527
Title:Paul Huskisson, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:October 23, 2019
Linked with 19A210
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-1335)
   Decision Date:June 5, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 20 2019Application (19A210) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 3, 2019 to October 18, 2019, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Aug 22 2019Application (19A210) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until October 18, 2019.
Oct 17 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 22, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 13 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 22, 2019 to December 23, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 14 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 23, 2019.
Dec 12 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 23, 2019 to January 22, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 13 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including January 22, 2020.
Jan 22 2020Brief of respondent United States of America in opposition filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Feb 04 2020Reply of petitioner Paul Huskisson filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 05 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/21/2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jason Michael Wilcox
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

jason.wilcox@kirkland.com
202-879-5200
Party name: Paul Huskisson
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America