No. 19-5267 | |
Title: | Michael St. Hubert, Petitioner v. United States |
Docketed: | July 23, 2019 |
Linked with 18A1245 | |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (16-10874) |
Decision Date: | November 15, 2018 |
Rehearing Denied: | March 19, 2019 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
May 29 2019 | Application (18A1245) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 17, 2019 to July 18, 2019, submitted to Justice Thomas. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceLower Court Orders/Opinions | |
May 31 2019 | Application (18A1245) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until July 18, 2019. |
Jul 18 2019 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due August 22, 2019) |
PetitionAppendixProof of ServiceMotion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisOther | |
Jul 29 2019 | Waiver of right of respondent United States of America to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Aug 08 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019. |
Aug 26 2019 | Response Requested. (Due September 25, 2019) |
Sep 20 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 25, 2019 to October 25, 2019, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Sep 23 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 25, 2019. |
Sep 25 2019 | Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Oct 21 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 25, 2019 to December 2, 2019, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Oct 21 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including December 2, 2019. |
Dec 02 2019 | Brief of respondent United States of America in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count | |
Dec 16 2019 | Reply of petitioner Michael St. Hubert filed. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Apr 29 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/15/2020. |
May 12 2020 | Rescheduled. |
May 18 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/21/2020. |
May 19 2020 | Rescheduled. |
May 22 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/28/2020. |
May 26 2020 | Rescheduled. |
Jun 01 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/4/2020. |
Jun 08 2020 | Petition DENIED. Statement of Justice Sotomayor respecting the denial of certiorari. (Detached opinion). |
Jun 30 2020 | Petition for Rehearing filed. |
OtherProof of ServiceMain Document | |
Dec 09 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/8/2021. |
Jan 11 2021 | Rehearing DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Brenda Greenberg Bryn Counsel of Record | Federal Public Defender One East Broward Boulevard Suite 1100 Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301 brenda_bryn@fd.org | 954-356-7436 |
Party name: Michael St. Hubert | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Noel J. Francisco Counsel of Record | Solicitor General United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 oldSupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: United States of America | ||
Other | ||
Daniel Ward Counsel of Record | Ropes & Gray LLP Prudential Tower, 800 Boylston Street Boston, MA 02199-3600 daniel.ward@ropesgray.com | 617-951-7703 |
Party name: National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers |