No. 19-520
Vide 19-351
Title:Alan Philipp, et al., Petitioners
v.
Federal Republic of Germany, et al.
Docketed:October 22, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-7064, 17-7117)
   Decision Date:July 10, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:June 18, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 18 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 21, 2019)
PetitionAppendixProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 30 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 21, 2019 to December 13, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 01 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 13, 2019.
Dec 13 2019Brief of respondents Germany, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 30 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/17/2020.
Dec 30 2019Reply of petitioners Alan Philipp, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 21 2020The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Nicholas Michael O'Donnell
    Counsel of Record
Sullivan & Worcester LLP
One Post Office Square
Boston, MA 02109

nodonnell@sullivanlaw.com
617-338-2814
Party name: Alan Philipp, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Jonathan M. Freiman
    Counsel of Record
Wiggin & Dana LLP
One Century Tower
P.O. Box 1832
New Haven, CT 06508-1832

jfreiman@wiggin.com
203-498-4584
Party name: Germany, et al.