No. 19-518
Title:Colorado Department of State, Petitioner
v.
Micheal Baca, et al.
Docketed:October 21, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-1173)
   Decision Date:August 20, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 16 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 20, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 23 2019Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Micheal Baca.
Blanket Consent
Nov 07 2019Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Thomas E. Weaver.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 07 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Colorado Department of State.
Blanket Consent
Nov 20 2019Brief of respondent Micheal Baca in support filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 20 2019Brief amicus curiae of Michael T. Morley in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 20 2019Brief amici curiae of South Dakota, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 20 2019Brief amicus curiae of National Conference of Commissioners on Uniform State Laws filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 20 2019Brief amicus curiae of Interested Legal Scholar Robert M. Hardway filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/10/2020.
Dec 04 2019Reply of petitioner Colorado Department of State filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 13 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/17/2020.
Jan 17 2020Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Thomas E. Weaver GRANTED.
Jan 17 2020Petition GRANTED. The petition for a writ of certiorari in No. 19-465 is granted. The cases are consolidated, and a total of one hour is allotted for oral argument. VIDED.
Jan 17 2020Because the Court has consolidated these cases for briefing and oral argument, future filings and activity in the cases will now be reflected on the docket of No. 19-465. Subsequent filings in these cases must therefore be submitted through the electronic filing system in No. 19-465. Each document submitted in connection with one or more of these cases must include on its cover the case number and caption for each case in which the filing is intended to be submitted. Where a filing is submitted in fewer than all of the cases, the docket entry will reflect the case number(s) in which the filing is submitted; a document filed in all of the consolidated cases will be noted as “VIDED.”
Jan 27 2020Blanket Consent filed Peter Bret Chiafalo, et al. and Micheal Baca, et al. VIDED.
Blanket Consent
Feb 11 2020Blanket Consent filed by Colorado Department of State. VIDED.
Blanket Consent
Feb 11 2020Blanket Consent filed by Washington. VIDED.
Blanket Consent
Feb 11 2020Application (19A894) of Presidential Electors to file a consolidated opening brief on the merits in excess of the word limit, submitted to Justice Sotomayor. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 14 2020Application (19A894) of Presidential Electors to file a consolidated opening brief on the merits in excess of the word limit is granted by Justice Sotomayor provided that the brief does not exceed 16,000 words. VIDED.
Feb 18 2020Motion of Colorado Department of State for an extension of time to file the joint appendix in No. 19-518 filed.
Main Document
Feb 20 2020Motion of Colorado Department of State to extend the time to file the joint appendix in No. 19-518 is granted and the time is extended to and including April 1, 2020.
Feb 21 2020SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, April 28, 2020 (amended March 10, 2020).
Feb 26 2020Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 10th Circuit.
Feb 26 2020The record of the USCA 10th Circuit is available on PACER.
Mar 02 2020Brief of Presidential Electors filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 05 2020Brief amicus curiae of Citizens for Self-Governance filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 06 2020Brief amicus curiae of Professor Derek T. Muller in support of neither party filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 06 2020Brief amici curiae of Michael L. Rosin, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 06 2020Brief amicus curiae of Independence Institute filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 09 2020Brief amicus curiae of Professor Edward B. Foley in support of neither party filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 09 2020Brief amicus curiae of Jerry H. Goldfeder filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 09 2020Brief amicus curiae of Making Every Vote Count Foundation in support of neither party filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 09 2020Brief amicus curiae of Vinz Koller filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 09 2020Brief amicus curiae of Michael T. Morley in support of neither party filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 10 2020This case in no longer consolidated with No. 19-465, Chiafalo v. Washington, and one hour is allotted for oral argument in this case. Justice Sotomayor took no part in the consideration of this order.
Mar 10 2020Letter from Clerk of Court to counsel of record noting that Justice Sotomayor will not continue to participate in this case.
Main Document
Mar 19 2020CIRCULATED
Apr 01 2020Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Apr 01 2020Brief of Colorado Department of State filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceOther
Apr 02 2020Brief amici curiae of Presidential Electors Mary Beth Corsentino, Stratton Rollins Heath, Jr., and Celeste Landry filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 03 2020ORAL ARGUMENT POSTPONED.
Apr 08 2020Amicus brief of The Colorado Democratic Party not accepted for filing. (April 08, 2020)
Apr 08 2020Brief amicus curiae of The Colorado Democratic Party filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 08 2020Brief amicus curiae of Eagle Forum Education & Legal Defense Fund filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 08 2020Brief amicus curiae of Colorado Republican Committee filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 08 2020Brief amici curiae of South Dakota and 44 States and the District of Columbia filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 08 2020Brief amici curiae of Campaign Legal Center and Issue One filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 08 2020Brief amicus curiae and appendix of Professor Robert W. Bennett filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 08 2020Brief amicus curiae of Interested Legal Scholar filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 08 2020Brief amicus curiae of The Republican National Committee filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 08 2020Brief amicus curiae of National Conference of Commissioners on Uniform State Laws filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 13 2020Argument to be rescheduled for May 2020.
Apr 15 2020RESCHEDULED FOR ARGUMENT on Wednesday, May 13, 2020.
Apr 20 2020Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner GRANTED.
May 01 2020Reply of Presidential Electors Baca, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 13 2020Argued. For petitioner: Philip J. Weiser, Attorney General, Denver, Colo. For respondents: Jason Harrow, Los Angeles, Cal.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Eric Reuel Olson
    Counsel of Record
Colorado Department of Law, Office of the Attorney General
1300 Broadway
10th Floor
Denver, CO 80203

eric.olson@coag.gov
7205086548
Party name: Colorado Department of State
Attorneys for Respondents
Jason Seth Harrow
    Counsel of Record
Equal Citizens
3243 S. La Cienega Blvd., Suite B
Los Angeles, CA 90016

jason.harrow@gmail.com
(610) 357-9614
Party name: Micheal Baca, et al.
L. Lawrence Lessig
    Counsel of Record
Equal Citizens
12 Eliot St.
Cambridge, MA 02138

lessig@law.harvard.edu
617-496-1124
Party name: Micheal Baca
Noah Guzzo PurcellOffice of the Attorney General
1125 Washington Street, SE
P.O. Box 40100
Olympia, WA 98504-0100

noahp@atg.wa.gov
360-753-2536
Party name: Washington
Other
Jessica Ring AmunsonJenner & Block LLP
1099 New York Avenue NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

JAmunson@jenner.com
202-639-6023
Party name: Professor Edward B. Foley
James Bopp Jr.
    Counsel of Record
The Bopp Law Firm, PC
The National Building
1 South Sixth Street
Terre Haute, IN 47807

jboppjr@aol.com
8122322434
Party name: National Conference of Commissioners on Uniform State Laws
Andrew John Dhuey456 Boynton Avenue
Berkeley, CA 94707

ajdhuey@comcast.net
(510) 528-8200
Party name: Vinz Koller
Michael Nicholas DonofrioStris & Maher LLP
28 Elm Street, 2d Floor
Montpelier, VT 05602

michael.donofrio@strismaher.com
8025220649
Party name: Michael L. Rosin, et al.
Rita Martin DunawayAttorney at Law
2379 Massanetta Springs Road
Harrisonburg, VA 22801

rdunaway@cosaction.com
5408301229
Party name: Citizens for Self-Governance
Julian Richard Ellis Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, LLP
410 17th Street, Suite 2200
Denver, CO 80202

jellis@bhfs.com
303-223-1142
Party name: Colorado Republican Committee
Paul R. Franke III
    Counsel of Record
Moye White LLP
1400 16th Street, 6th Floor
Denver, CO 80202

paul.franke@moyewhite.com
303 292-2900
Party name: The Colorado Democratic Party
Jerrold Joseph GanzfriedGanzfried Law
5335 Wisconsin Avenue, NW Suite 440
Washington, DC 20015

JJG@ganzfriedlaw.com
202-486-2004
Party name: Making Every Vote Count Foundation
Jennifer Lynn Gilbert
    Counsel of Record
Ireland Stapleton Pryor and Pascoe
717 17th Street
Denver, CO 80202

jgilbert@irelandstapleton.com
720-401-0439
Party name: Interested Legal Scholar
Jerry H. GoldfederStroock & Stroock & Lavan LLP
180 Maiden Lane
New York, NY 10038

jgoldfeder@stroock.com
212-806-5857
Party name: Jerry H. Goldfeder
Christopher Michael Lauvane Jackson
    Counsel of Record
Holland & Hart LLP
555 17th Street, Suite 3200
Denver, CO 80202

cmjackson@hollandhart.com
3032958305
Party name: Presidential Electors Mary Beth Corsentino, Stratton Rollins Heath, Jr., and Celeste Landry
David Benjamin KopelIndependence Institute
Independence Institute
727 East 16th Avenue
Denver, CO 80203

david@i2i.org
3032796536
Party name: Independence Institute
Tobias Samuel Loss-Eaton
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin LLP
1501 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

tlosseaton@sidley.com
(202) 736-8427
Party name: Campaign Legal Center and Issue One
Michael T. Morley
    Counsel of Record
Florida State University College of Law
425 W. Jefferson Street, Roberts Hall, Office 313
Tallahassee, FL 32306

michaelmorleyesq@hotmail.com
8607783883
Party name: Michael T. Morley
Andrew L. Schlafly
    Counsel of Record
939 Old Chester Road
Far Hills, NJ 07931

aschlafly@aol.com
908-719-8608
Party name: Eagle Forum Education & Legal Defense Fund
Ian Seth SpeirNussbaum Speir Gleason PLLC
2 N. Cascade Ave.
Suite 1430
Colorado Springs, CO 80903

ian@nussbaumspeir.com
7194284937
Party name: Professor Derek T. Muller
Paul S. Swedlund
    Counsel of Record
Attorney General's Office
Office of the Attorney General
1302 E. Highway 14, Suite 1
Pierre, SD 57501-8501

paul.swedlund@state.sd.us
6057735402
Party name: South Dakota and 44 States and the District of Columbia
Jack Samuel Tenenbaum
    Counsel of Record
Bluhm Legal Clinic
Northwestern Pritzker School of Law
375 East Chicago Ave.
Chicago, IL 60611

s-tenenbaum@law.northwestern.edu
3125034808
Party name: Professor Robert W. Bennett
Michael Eugene Toner
    Counsel of Record
Wiley, Rein & Fielding
1776 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

mtoner@wiley.law
2027197545
Party name: The Republican National Committee
Thomas E. Weaver
    Counsel of Record
PO Box 1056
Bremerton, WA 98337

tweaver@tomweaverlaw.com
3607929345
Party name: Thomas E. Weaver