No. 19-5133 | |
Title: | Andrew Anthony Brown, Petitioner v. William P. Barr, Attorney General of the United States |
Docketed: | July 10, 2019 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (18-14151) |
Decision Date: | January 31, 2019 |
Rehearing Denied: | April 10, 2019 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Jul 01 2019 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due August 9, 2019) |
Jul 01 2019 | Pursuant to Rule 34.6 and Paragraph 9 of the Guidelines for the Submission of Documents to the Supreme Court's Electronic Filing System, filings in this case should be submitted in paper form only, and should not be submitted through the Court's electronic filing system. |
Aug 05 2019 | Waiver of right of respondent Barr, Att'y Gen. to respond filed. |
Aug 15 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019. |
Sep 06 2019 | Response Requested. (Due October 7, 2019) |
Oct 02 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 7, 2019 to November 6, 2019, submitted to The Clerk. |
Oct 03 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 6, 2019. |
Oct 29 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 6, 2019 to December 6, 2019, submitted to The Clerk. |
Oct 30 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including December 6, 2019. |
Dec 02 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 6, 2019 to January 6, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. |
Dec 03 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including January 6, 2020. |
Dec 31 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 6, 2020 to February 5, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. |
Jan 02 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including February 5, 2020. |
Feb 05 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 5, 2020 to March 6, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. |
Feb 05 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including March 6, 2020. |
Mar 06 2020 | Brief of respondent William P. Barr, Attorney General filed. |
Mar 26 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/17/2020. |
Apr 20 2020 | Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of the confession of error by the Solicitor General in his brief for the respondent filed on March 6, 2020. |
May 22 2020 | JUDGMENT ISSUED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Andrew Anthony Brown | #2019033908 Duval County Jail 500 E. Adams St. Jacksonville, FL 32202 | |
Party name: Andrew A. Brown | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Noel J. Francisco Counsel of Record | Solicitor General United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: Barr, Att'y Gen. |