No. 19-512
Title:Anthony Robinson, Petitioner
v.
Department of Education
Docketed:October 21, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-1822)
   Decision Date:March 6, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:May 7, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 05 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 20, 2019)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 13 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 20, 2019 to December 20, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 14 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 20, 2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Quinn Breece Lobato
    Counsel of Record
Lobato Law
210 Grisdale Hill
Riva, MD 21140

quinn.lobato@gmail.com
2403054770
Party name: Anthony Robinson
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States Department of Education