No. 19-511
Title:Facebook, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Noah Duguid, et al.
Docketed:October 21, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-15320)
   Decision Date:June 13, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:August 22, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 17 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 20, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 07 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Facebook, Inc.
Blanket Consent
Nov 18 2019Waiver of right of respondent Noah Duguid to respond filed.
Main Document
Nov 20 2019Brief amicus curiae of Credit Union National Association, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 20 2019Brief of respondent United States filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Nov 20 2019Brief amici curiae of Midland Credit Management, Inc. and Encore Capital Group, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 20 2019Brief amici curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America and Business Roundtable filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 20 2019Brief amicus curiae of ACA International, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 20 2019Brief amicus curiae of Retail Litigation Center, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 25 2019Waiver of the 14-day waiting period under Rule 15.5 filed.
Main Document
Nov 26 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/13/2019.
Dec 02 2019Reply of petitioner Facebook, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 04 2019Response Requested. (Due January 3, 2020)
Jan 03 2020Brief of respondent Noah Duguid in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 06 2020Letter waiving the 14-day waiting period for the distribution of the petition pursuant to Rule 15.5 filed.
Main Document
Jan 08 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/24/2020.
Jan 10 2020Reply of petitioner Facebook, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

paul.clement@kirkland.com
2023895000
Party name: Facebook, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondents
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Sergei LembergLemberg Law, LLC
43 Danbury Road
Wilton, CT 06897

slemberg@lemberglaw.com
203-653-2250
Party name: Noah Duguid
Other
Shay Dvoretzky
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20001-2113

sdvoretzky@jonesday.com
2028793474
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America and Business Roundtable
Julian Richard Ellis Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, LLP
410 17th Street, Suite 2200
Denver, CO 80202

jellis@bhfs.com
303-223-1142
Party name: Credit Union National Association, Inc.
Joseph Russell Palmore
    Counsel of Record
Morrison & Foerster LLP
2000 Pennsylvania Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20006

jpalmore@mofo.com
202-887-6940
Party name: Retail Litigation Center, Inc.
Zachary Charles Schauf
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block, LLP
1099 New York Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ZSchauf@jenner.com
202-637-6379
Party name: Midland Credit Management, Inc. and Encore Capital Group, Inc.
Steven Gregory White
    Counsel of Record
Gray Reed & McGraw LLP
1601 Elm Street
Suite 4600
Dallas, TX 75201

gwhite@grayreed.com
214-954-4135
Party name: ACA International, Inc.